KY SB79 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 25)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 311 to define "direct primary care membership agreement"; establish conditions for services under a direct primary care membership agreement; exempt from KRS Chapter 304.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to health care providers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17Senatesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 25)
2017-03-07Senatedelivered to Governor
2017-03-07Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2017-03-07Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2017-03-07SenateBill passed 37-1
2017-03-07SenateSenate concurred in House Committee Substitute
2017-03-07Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute on Tuesday, March 7, 2017
2017-03-07Senateto Rules (S)
2017-03-06Senatereceived in Senate
2017-03-06House3rd reading, passed 85-6 with Committee Substitute
2017-02-24Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 27, 2017
2017-02-24House2nd reading, to Rules
2017-02-23Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2017-02-22Houseposted in committee
2017-02-21Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2017-02-16Housereceived in House
2017-02-15Senate3rd reading, passed 35-1 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1)
2017-02-15Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 15, 2017
2017-02-13Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2017-02-09Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2017-02-08Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2017-01-07Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2017-01-03Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback