KY SB76 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 141 to establish a nonrefundable, nontransferable individual income tax credit related to stillbirths for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2020, but before January 1, 2024; require reporting by the Department of Revenue; amend KRS 141.0205 to order the credit; amend KRS 131.190 to allow reporting.
Title
AN ACT relating to providing an individual income tax credit for stillbirths.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Children and Minors
Deaths
Health and Medical Services
Reports Mandated
Taxation
Taxation, Income--Individual
Women
Deaths
Health and Medical Services
Reports Mandated
Taxation
Taxation, Income--Individual
Women
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/sb76.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/sb76/orig_bill.pdf |