KY SB76 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 315.522 to clarify that a reciprocal license may be granted to an out-of-state provider located in one of Kentucky's seven contiguous bordering states; establish that requirements for licensure in the contiguous state, including any requirement for a physical location in the state as a condition of issuing or renewing a license, be substantially similar to the licensure requirements in this state; amend KRS 315.191 to reorganize membership of the advisory council to include two members of the durable medical equipment profession.
Title
AN ACT relating to medical service providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2014-03-17 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 25, 2014 |
2014-03-17 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-02-18 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-13 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2014-02-12 | House | received in House |
2014-02-12 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 12, 2014 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-05 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-01-17 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2014-01-14 | Senate | introduced in Senate |