KY SB74 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 211.684 to define "state child and maternal fatality review team"; require the Department for Public Health to establish a state child and maternal fatality review team; modify required annual reporting requirements; amend KRS 216.2929 to require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to report methods of delivery by hospital annually on its website beginning December 1, 2024.
Title
AN ACT relating to public health.
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Frommeyer [R] | Sen. Denise Harper Angel [D] | Sen. Gerald Neal [D] | Sen. Lindsey Tichenor [R] |
Sen. David Yates [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/FINAL hcs1 hfa2 hcta1 RSN# 3253 (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 474 (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2929 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 474 (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2929 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | signed by Governor |
2024-04-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2024-04-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-04-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-04-15 | Senate | passed 29-5-2 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1), floor amendment (2), and committee amendment (1-title) |
2024-04-15 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendment (2) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-04-15 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2024-04-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-1 with Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendment (2) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-04-12 | House | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-04-12 | House | floor amendment withdrawn Floor Amendment (1) |
2024-03-22 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-03-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-08 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-07 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-03-01 | House | to Families & Children (H) |
2024-02-23 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-23 | House | received in House |
2024-02-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 22, 2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | recommitted to Families & Children (S) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-01-30 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-01-08 | Senate | to Families & Children (S) |
2024-01-05 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-01-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |