KY SB73 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 174)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 156 to establish a pilot program for performance-based professional development projects; require the local board of education to determine the parameters for the pilot program; require the Kentucky Department of Education to study the completed pilot projects and report its findings by August 1, 2022; amend KRS 158.070 to sunset the granting of nontraditional instruction days after the 2020-2021 year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to school districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 711 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 403 (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 390 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25Senatesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 174)
2018-04-13Senatedelivered to Governor
2018-04-13Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-04-13Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-04-13Senatepassed 37-0
2018-04-13SenateSenate concurred in House Committee Substitute
2018-04-13Senatevote on non concurrence with House Committee Substitute reconsidered
2018-04-13Senatebill reconsidered
2018-04-13Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1)
2018-04-13Senateto Rules (S)
2018-04-13Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-27Houseto Rules (H)
2018-03-27Housereceived in House
2018-03-27SenateSenate refused to concur in House Committee Substitute (1)
2018-03-27Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) on Tuesday, March 27, 2018
2018-03-22Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-22House3rd reading, passed 86-8 with Committee Substitute
2018-02-27Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 28, 2018
2018-02-21House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-20Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-02-15Houseposted in committee
2018-01-25Houseto Education (H)
2018-01-23Housereceived in House
2018-01-22Senate3rd reading, passed 36-0
2018-01-22Senatefloor amendment (1) withdrawn
2018-01-22Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 22, 2018
2018-01-19Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-01-18Senatefloor amendment (1) filed
2018-01-18Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2018-01-10Senateto Education (S)
2018-01-09Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback