KY SB71 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 151)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to require inclusion of abstinence education in any human sexuality or sexually transmitted diseases curriculum.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to health education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 699 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 424 (Y: 77 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House: Adopt HFA 1 RCS# 423 (Y: 26 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 393 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13Senatesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 151)
2018-04-02Senatedelivered to Governor
2018-04-02Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-04-02Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-04-02SenateBill passed 36-1
2018-04-02SenateSenate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1)
2018-04-02Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute
2018-03-29Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-27Housepassed 77-14 with Committee Substitute
2018-03-27Housefloor amendment (1) defeated
2018-03-27House3rd reading
2018-03-21Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018
2018-03-21House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-20Housefloor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-03-20Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2018-03-16Houseposted in committee
2018-02-23Houseposted in committee
2018-01-29Houseto Education (H)
2018-01-25Housereceived in House
2018-01-24Senatefloor amendment (3) filed
2018-01-24Senatepassed 32-5
2018-01-24Senatefloor amendment (2) defeated
2018-01-24Senate3rd reading
2018-01-24Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 24, 2018
2018-01-22Senatefloor amendment (1) withdrawn
2018-01-18Senatefloor amendment (2) filed
2018-01-16Senatefloor amendment (1) filed
2018-01-11Senatereported favorably, to Rules
2018-01-10Senatereturned to Education (S)
2018-01-10Senate2nd reading
2018-01-10Senatetaken from Education (S)
2018-01-09Senateto Education (S)
2018-01-09Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2018-01-09Senate1st reading
2018-01-09Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2018-01-08Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback