KY SB71 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 65A to require proposed increases in ad valorem taxes and certain fees, and the levy of new ad valorem taxes or fees by special purpose governmental entities to be submitted to the legislative body of the county or city where the special purpose governmental entity is located for review; amend KRS 132.023 to conform; repeal KRS 65A.100; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2017.
Title
AN ACT relating to taxes and fees imposed by special purpose governmental entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | Senate | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2016-02-08 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2016-02-05 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2016-02-04 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2016-02-03 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2016-02-02 | Senate | floor amendment (1), (3), (4) to cs, (2-title) filed |
2016-02-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 3 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-01-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-01-07 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2016-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |