KY SB7 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - returned to Local Government (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 160.345 to allow a local board to require an annual report of activities from a school council; reduce the minimum number of teachers serving on the council to two; specify that a council decision is appealable to the local board; require the local board of education to adopt a policy allowing the board to initiate review of a school council decision; specify the alignment of council policy with local board policy; allow a teacher to be transferred while serving on the school council; specify that local board members may attend council meetings; permit a superintendent to forward qualified applicants to the principal instead of the council; alter principal hiring process requiring principal to be selected by the superintendent after consultation with school council; require school council authority to be transferred to the superintendent if a school is identified for comprehensive support and improvement; make technical corrections; amend to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to school councils.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1193 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18Housereturned to Local Government (H)
2020-03-18House2nd reading
2020-03-18Housetaken from Local Government (H)
2020-03-17Houseposting waived
2020-03-17Housereassigned to Local Government (H)
2020-03-17House1st reading
2020-03-17Housetaken from Education (H)
2020-02-10Houseto Education (H)
2020-02-06Housereceived in House
2020-02-06Senate3rd reading, passed 20-15 with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-02-06Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 6, 2020
2020-02-05Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-01-16Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2020-01-16Senate2nd reading
2020-01-16Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2020-01-15Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2020-01-15Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2020-01-15Senate1st reading
2020-01-15Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2020-01-13Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback