KY SB68 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 35)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 35)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 243.120 to require a licensee holding a distiller's license, Class A license, or Class B license to distill no less than 600 gallons in one year at the distillery's licensed premises; exempt a licensee that trains, educates, conducts research, or teaches about the distilling process, aging, or bottling of distilled spirits from the minimum distilling production requirements in KRS Chapter 243, so long as a licensee does not produce spirits for sale to the general public.
Title
AN ACT relating to the manufacturing of distilled spirits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 230 (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1550 (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1550 (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 35) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-11 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-05 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 78-15 |
2021-03-04 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-26 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | received in House |
2021-02-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-2-1 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 16, 2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-09 | Senate | to Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | to Licensing and Occupations (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |