KY SB67 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 20)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 20)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 243 to allow alcohol to be purchased to go or for delivery in conjunction with a meal, set conditions therefore, and require department to promulgate administrative regulation for closed container; amend KRS 243.034 to allow limited restaurant licensees to sell alcohol for delivery or to go in conjunction with a meal; amend KRS 243.084 to allow nonquota type 2 licensees to sell alcohol for delivery or to go in conjunction with a meal; amend KRS 243.155 to allow small farm winery licensees to sell alcohol for delivery or to go in conjunction with a meal; amend KRS 243.250 to allow quota retail drink licensees to sell alcohol for delivery or to go in conjunction with a meal; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to alcoholic beverage sales, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 222 (Y: 67 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1549 (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1549 (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 20) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-11 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-05 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 67-27 |
2021-03-04 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-26 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | received in House |
2021-02-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 28-7 with Committee Substitute |
2021-02-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 16, 2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2021-01-11 | Senate | to Licensing and Occupations (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Distilled Spirits
Effective Dates, Emergency
Fiscal Note
Local Mandate
Trade Practices and Retailing
Wines and Wineries
Distilled Spirits
Effective Dates, Emergency
Fiscal Note
Local Mandate
Trade Practices and Retailing
Wines and Wineries