KY SB67 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - 3rd reading, defeated 38-59 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - 3rd reading, defeated 38-59 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to be numbered KRS 158.142 to establish an option for early high school graduation beginning in the 2011-2012 school year; define the curriculum requirements for early graduation and unconditional admission into a Kentucky public two-year community and technical college and the requirements for conditional admission into a four-year public college; establish the Early Graduation Scholarship Certificate and the processes for awarding it and using it; create a new section of KRS Chapter 164 to create the early graduation scholarship fund to be administered by the Kentucky Higher Education Assistance Authority; amend KRS 157.360 to describe how state funds from the SEEK appropriation will be transferred to the scholarship fund to support early high school graduates; amend KRS 157.420 to conform; amend KRS 158.140 to limit the powers of the Kentucky Board of Education or a local board from imposing graduation requirements that would prohibit a student from pursuing an early graduation program; amend KRS 164.7879 to prescribe how an early graduate would qualify for a KEES award; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to early high school graduation and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | 3rd reading, defeated 38-59 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1) | |
2010-03-18 | floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-18 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 19, 2010 | |
2010-03-17 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-16 | floor amendment (1-title) filed | |
2010-03-16 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendments (1) and (2-title) | |
2010-03-11 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-12 | to Education (H) | |
2010-02-10 | received in House | |
2010-02-09 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2010-02-08 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 9, 2010 | |
2010-02-01 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-01-28 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-01-07 | to Education (S) | |
2010-01-06 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB67.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB67/bill.doc |