KY SB64 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 34)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 34)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 133.047 to define "reasonable fee" and "personnel time."
Title
AN ACT relating to property valuation administrator fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 34) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-03-24 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-23 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2016-03-21 | House | floor amendments (3) and (4) withdrawn |
2016-03-18 | House | floor amendments (3) and (4) filed |
2016-03-18 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2) withdrawn |
2016-03-18 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 21, 2016 |
2016-03-18 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-17 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed |
2016-03-17 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-03-15 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-11 | House | to State Government (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | received in House |
2016-02-09 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 9 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-03 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-01-07 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2016-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |