KY SB64 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 148 to create a Kentucky Center for African-American Heritage; provide for membership, terms, and organization; establish duties and objectives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Center for African-American Heritage.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-16 signed by Governor
2011-03-04 delivered to Governor
2011-03-04 enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2011-03-03 enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2011-03-02 received in Senate
2011-03-02 3rd reading, passed 96-0
2011-03-01 taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
2011-02-28 posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 1, 2011
2011-02-25 2nd reading, to Rules
2011-02-24 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2011-02-22 posted in committee
2011-02-17 to State Government (H)
2011-02-16 received in House
2011-02-15 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute
2011-02-15 posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 15, 2011
2011-02-10 reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute
2011-02-09 returned to State & Local Government (S)
2011-02-09 1st reading
2011-02-09 taken from State & Local Government (S)
2011-02-01 to State & Local Government (S)
2011-01-06 introduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback