KY SB63 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - to Small Business & Information Technology (H)
Pending: House Small Business & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - to Small Business & Information Technology (H)
Pending: House Small Business & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 7A.180, 7A.185, and 7A.190 to change the name of the Investments in Information Technology Improvement and Modernization Projects Oversight Board to the Information Technology Oversight Committee.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Information Technology Oversight Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2867 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | to Small Business & Information Technology (H) |
2024-01-18 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-18 | House | received in House |
2024-01-17 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 17, 2024 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-01-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-01-04 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2024-01-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-01-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |