KY SB63 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - returned to Labor & Industry (H)
Pending: House Labor and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - returned to Labor & Industry (H)
Pending: House Labor and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 342.120 require the Division of Workers' Compensation Funds to engage in an aggressive attempt to settle special fund claims; amend KRS 342.122 and eliminate all funding provided to the Labor Cabinet from special fund assessments.
Title
AN ACT relating to the workers' compensation special fund and Funding Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | returned to Labor & Industry (H) |
2014-03-25 | House | 2nd reading |
2014-03-25 | House | taken from Labor & Industry (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | returned to Labor & Industry (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | 1st reading |
2014-03-24 | House | taken from Labor & Industry (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | to Labor & Industry (H) |
2014-03-07 | House | received in House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | passed 22-16 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2014-03-06 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday. March 6, 2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2014-02-28 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2014-02-12 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-11 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-01-15 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2014-01-09 | Senate | introduced in Senate |