KY SB63 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 211 to require the Department for Medicaid Services, the Department for Public Health, the Office of Health Policy, and the Personnel Cabinet to collaborate to identify goals and benchmarks to reduce the incidence of diabetes in Kentucky, improve diabetes care, and control complications associated with diabetes; require each to report on the impact of diabetes, programs and activities for controlling and preventing diabetes, action plans to address diabetes, and budget plans for programs addressing diabetes by January 10 of each odd-numbered year to the Legislative Research Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to diabetes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-16 signed by Governor
2011-03-04 delivered to Governor
2011-03-04 enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2011-03-04 passed 37-0
2011-03-04 Senate concurred in House floor amendment (1)
2011-03-04 posted for passage for concurrence in House floor amendment (1)
2011-03-02 received in Senate
2011-03-02 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with floor amendment (1)
2011-03-01 floor amendments (2) and (3-title) filed
2011-02-28 floor amendment (1) filed
2011-02-28 posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 1, 2011
2011-02-25 2nd reading, to Rules
2011-02-24 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2011-02-22 posted in committee
2011-02-15 to Health & Welfare (H)
2011-02-14 received in House
2011-02-11 3rd reading, passed 36-0
2011-02-10 posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 11, 2011
2011-02-10 2nd reading, to Rules
2011-02-09 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2011-02-08 reassigned to Health & Welfare (S)
2011-02-01 to State & Local Government (S)
2011-01-06 introduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback