KY SB61 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 54)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 54)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 158.142 to delete end-of-course examination and ACT benchmark requirements from the early high school graduation program.
Title
AN ACT relating to early high school graduation.
Sponsors
Sen. George Wise [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 391 (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1993 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1993 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 54) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-25 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-25 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-24 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-1 |
2022-03-24 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed |
2022-03-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | to Education (H) |
2022-02-02 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-02 | House | received in House |
2022-02-02 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 02, 2022 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-01-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-10 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |