KY SB61 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 96)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 96)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 131.030, relating to revenue, to make a technical correction.
Title
AN ACT authorizing a Murray State University capital project, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 367 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SCTA 1 RSN# 517 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 517 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SCTA 1 RSN# 517 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 517 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 96) |
2018-03-21 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-21 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-21 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-21 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-20 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2018-03-20 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2018-03-19 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-03-14 | House | posted in committee |
2018-03-14 | House | posting waived |
2018-03-13 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-03-09 | House | received in House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) & committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 8, 2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute & committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-01-05 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2018-01-04 | Senate | introduced in Senate |