KY SB6 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 108)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 108)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 218A.170 to require a practitioner or a pharmacist to sell or distribute a nontoxic composition, which permanently captures the controlled substance, for the sequestration or deactivation and disposal of unused, unwanted, or expired controlled substances anytime a controlled substance is sold or distributed.
Title
AN ACT relating to the safe disposal of controlled substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/HCS 1 RSN# 638 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 417 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 2 RSN# 532 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 532 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 417 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 2 RSN# 532 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 532 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 108) |
2018-04-10 | Senate | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2018-03-29 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Bill passed 36-1 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute for Tuesday, March 27, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute |
2018-03-22 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2018-03-22 | House | taken from Rules |
2018-03-21 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill |
2018-03-19 | House | posted in committee |
2018-03-19 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2018-03-16 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2018-03-16 | House | 2nd reading |
2018-03-16 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2018-03-15 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2018-03-15 | House | 1st reading |
2018-03-15 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2018-03-15 | House | received in House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute (2) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | passed 34-2 with Committee Substitute (2) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee Substitute (1) withdrawn |
2018-03-14 | Senate | committee amendment (1) withdrawn |
2018-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | recommitted to Health & Welfare (S) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2018-03-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 12, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute & committee amendment (1) |
2018-01-03 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2018-01-02 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |