KY SB6 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-04 - to Local Government (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-04 - to Local Government (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 432 to define terms; set out the intent of the chapter and prevent the adoption of policies, administrative regulations, or laws that restrict the enforcement of federal immigration laws; allow for determining the immigration status of a person on reasonable suspicion, the arrest of an unlawful alien upon probable cause, and the transference of a convicted unlawful alien to the United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement or the United States Customs and Border Protection; specify that officials or agencies may not be prohibited from sharing the immigration status of a person under specific instances; indemnify a governmental law enforcement officer where the officer has been brought into a legal action; make it a Class D felony to intentionally smuggle persons for profit or commercial purposes, a Class B felony if the smuggled person is under 18 or the offense involved a deadly weapon, or a Class C felony if serious physical injury is used or threatened; define trespassing by an unauthorized alien in the first degree and set out the penalties for conviction; make it a Class A misdemeanor for a person to transport or conceal unauthorized aliens, or encourage an unauthorized alien to come to this state; amend KRS 186A.320 to include motor vehicles used in violation of Section 8 of this Act in the impoundment procedures.
Title
AN ACT relating to unauthorized aliens.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-04 | to Local Government (H) | |
2011-02-02 | received in House | |
2011-01-07 | passed 24-14 with Committee Substitute | |
2011-01-07 | floor amendment (2) defeated | |
2011-01-07 | 3rd reading | |
2011-01-07 | floor amendment (1) withdrawn | |
2011-01-07 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 7, 2011 | |
2011-01-06 | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) filed | |
2011-01-06 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute | |
2011-01-05 | returned to Judiciary (S) | |
2011-01-05 | 2nd reading | |
2011-01-05 | taken from Judiciary (S) | |
2011-01-04 | returned to Judiciary (S) | |
2011-01-04 | 1st reading | |
2011-01-04 | taken from Judiciary (S) | |
2011-01-04 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB6.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB6/bill.doc |