KY SB57 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-31 - to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 162.062 to remove the applicability to plans for the renovation of existing public school buildings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to public school building renovations and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, scta 1 RSN# 1171 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-31Houseto Education (H)
2020-01-29Housereceived in House
2020-01-28Senate3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-01-27Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 28, 2020
2020-01-24Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-01-23Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-01-08Senateto Education (S)
2020-01-07Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback