KY SB56 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 35)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 35)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 438.305 to change the definition of "proof of age"; amend KRS 438.310 to prohibit the sale of tobacco, alternative nicotine, or vapor products to persons under the age of 21; amend KRS 438.311 to make it unlawful for persons under 21 to buy tobacco, alternative nicotine, or vapor products; establish a fine of not less than $50 nor more than $500 for a person over the age of 18 who violates the age restrictions for purchasing or receiving tobacco, alternative nicotine, or vapor products; remove status offense designation for violations by persons under 18; remove jurisdiction of the juvenile section of the District Court for violations by persons under 18; remove references to arrest and court appearances by persons under 18; amend KRS 438.313 to prohibit the wholesale, retail, or manufacturer distribution of tobacco or vapor products to persons under 21; remove references to arrest and court appearances for persons under 18; amend KRS 438.315 to raise the minimum age for vending machine sales of tobacco, alternative nicotine, or vapor products to 21; remove references to arrest and court appearances for persons under 18; amend KRS 438.325 to establish 21 as the age limit regarding tobacco, alternative nicotine, or vapor product retail notifications; amend KRS 438.330 to set tobacco, alternative nicotine, and vapor product enforcement standards so that they relate to persons under the age of 21; amend KRS 438.350 regarding possession of tobacco, alternative nicotine, or vapor products by a person under age 21; amend KRS 600.020 to remove tobacco offenses from the definition of "status offense action"; amend 610.010 to remove tobacco related offenses as provided in KRS 438.305 to 438.340 from the jurisdiction of the juvenile section of the District Court; amend 630.020 to remove tobacco related offenses as provided in KRS 438.305 to 438.340 from the jurisdiction of the juvenile section of the District Court; amend 630.120 to remove the reference to child tobacco offenses under KRS 438.305 to 438.340; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2021.
Title
AN ACT relating to the sale of tobacco, alternative nicotine, and vapor products and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - House: For Consent RCS# 313 (Y: 64 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, sfa 1, sfta 2 RSN# 1162 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, sfa 1, sfta 2 RSN# 1162 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 35) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-19 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-19 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 64-20 |
2020-03-18 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | returned to Rules |
2020-03-05 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 6, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-04 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-31 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-28 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-01-24 | House | received in House |
2020-01-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 28-10 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 23, 2020 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2-title) filed |
2020-01-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Children and Minors
Commerce
Courts, District
Crimes and Punishments
Effective Dates, Delayed
Local Mandate
Public Health
Sales
Tobacco
Vaping
Commerce
Courts, District
Crimes and Punishments
Effective Dates, Delayed
Local Mandate
Public Health
Sales
Tobacco
Vaping