KY SB55 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - returned to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 42 to create a six-member Blockchain Technology Working Group; attach the working group to the Commonwealth Office of Technology; require the working group to examine the applicability of blockchain technology for various utility sectors and report to the Governor and the LRC by December 1 of each year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to blockchain technology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1246 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18Housereturned to Rules
2020-03-18Housetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2020-03-10Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2020-03-06House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-05Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-03-03Houseposted in committee
2020-02-27Houseto Small Business & Information Technology (H)
2020-02-25Housereceived in House
2020-02-24Senate3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-02-21Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 24, 2020
2020-02-13Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-12Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-02-06Senatereassigned to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2020-01-13Senateto Banking & Insurance (S)
2020-01-07Senateintroduced in Senate
2019-12-11SenatePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback