KY SB51 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 201)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 201)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 304.17A-611 to prohibit insurers from requiring or using certain utilization reviews for certain prescription drugs used to treat alcohol or opioid use disorder; amend KRS 205.536 to prohibit the Department for Medicaid Services or a Medicaid managed care organization from requiring or using certain utilization reviews for certain prescription drugs used to treat alcohol or opioid use disorder; create a new section of Subtitle 17A of KRS Chapter 304 to require insurers to report the number and type of providers prescribing medication for addiction treatment; require the Department of Insurance to report to the General Assembly and State Board of Medical Licensure; EFFECTIVE in part January 1, 2022.
Title
AN ACT relating to addiction treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1829 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 443 (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 1557 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 443 (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 1557 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 201) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Bill passed 36-0 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred in House floor amendment (1) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House floor amendment (1) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-30 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-2 with floor amendment (1) |
2021-03-29 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2021-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-05 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-04 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-25 | House | to Health & Family Services (H) |
2021-02-24 | House | received in House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 23, 2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Alcoholism
Drugs and Medicines
Effective Dates, Delayed
Health Benefit Mandate
Insurance, Health
Medicaid
Public Medical Assistance
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Drugs and Medicines
Effective Dates, Delayed
Health Benefit Mandate
Insurance, Health
Medicaid
Public Medical Assistance
Reports Mandated
State Agencies