KY SB51 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-20 - to State Government (H)
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-20 - to State Government (H)
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 6.525, relating to legislative retirement, to prevent members of the General Assembly from consolidating their accounts under various retirement systems for the purpose of determining benefits.
Title
AN ACT relating to retirement and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-20 | to State Government (H) | |
2010-01-14 | received in House | |
2010-01-13 | 3rd reading, passed 21-17 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-01-13 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 13, 2010 | |
2010-01-13 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-01-12 | returned to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-01-12 | 2nd reading | |
2010-01-12 | taken from committee | |
2010-01-11 | returned to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-01-11 | 1st reading | |
2010-01-11 | taken from committee | |
2010-01-06 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB51.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB51/bill.doc |