KY SB50 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 70)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 205.647 to require the Department for Medicaid Services to establish and directly administer an outpatient pharmacy benefit program for all Medicaid beneficiaries; permit the department to contract with a third-party administrator on a fee-for-service reimbursement basis; require a third-party administrator to utilize the outpatient pharmacy benefit program established by the department; exempt outpatient pharmacy services provided by a health care facility that is registered as a covered entity pursuant to 42 U.S.C. sec. 256b from the provisions of this section; EMERGENCY; effective July 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to pharmacy benefits in the Medicaid program and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/hcs1, hca 1T, FINAL PASSAGE RSN# 1373 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 224 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1243 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27Senatesigned by Governor (Acts ch. 70)
2020-03-18Senatedelivered to Governor
2020-03-18Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-03-18Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-03-18Senatepassed 30-1
2020-03-18SenateSenate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-03-18Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and House committee amendment (1-title)
2020-03-17Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-12House3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-03-11Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 12, 2020
2020-03-11House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-10Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-03-02Houseposted in committee
2020-02-24Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2020-02-20Housereceived in House
2020-02-20Senate3rd reading, passed 33-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-02-20Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 20, 2020
2020-02-20Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-02-19Senaterecommitted to Health & Welfare (S)
2020-02-18Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 19, 2020
2020-02-06Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-05Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-01-31Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2020-01-28Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback