KY SB50 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 191)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 213.101 to require a report of dispensing a prescription for RU-486, cytotec, pitocin, mifeprex, misoprostol, or any other drug or combination of drugs that are intended to end a pregnancy to the Vital Statistics Branch within 15 days after the end of the month in which the prescription was dispensed; require report to be made available on the cabinet's Web site; create a new section of KRS 311.710 to 311.820 to require a report of dispensing a prescription for RU-486, cytotec, pitocin, mifeprex, misoprostol, or any other drug or combination of drugs that are intended to end a pregnancy; amend KRS 311.723 and 311.735 to correct citations to KRS 213.101.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to abortion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 981 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 316 (Y: 75 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 784 (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Senatesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 191)
2019-03-14Senatedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14SenateBill passed 31-4
2019-03-14SenateSenate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1-title)
2019-03-14Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1-title) on Thursday, March 14, 2019
2019-03-13Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-13Housepassed 75-19 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1-title)
2019-03-13Housefloor amendment (2) ruled not germane
2019-03-13House3rd reading
2019-02-22Housefloor amendments (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (4-title) filed to bill
2019-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019
2019-02-22House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-21Housefloor amendment (1-title) filed
2019-02-21Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2019-02-19Houseposted in committee
2019-02-06Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2019-02-05Housereceived in House
2019-01-11Senate3rd reading, passed 30-6
2019-01-10Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 11, 2019
2019-01-10Senatereported favorably, to Rules
2019-01-09Senatereturned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-01-09Senate2nd reading
2019-01-09Senatetaken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-01-08Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-01-08Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2019-01-08Senate1st reading
2019-01-08Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2019-01-08Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback