KY SB50 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 68)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 68)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 158.070 to establish a school district calendar committee and determine its membership; allow inclusion of a variable student instructional year in a school calendar; define a variable student instructional year; establish school calendar adoption procedures; require notice to be given to the media for school board meetings regarding the school calendar; provide that districts adopting a school calendar with the first student attendance day no earlier than the Monday closest to August 26 may use a variable student instructional year; make changes throughout to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to the school calendar.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 68) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-08 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-08 | House | 3rd reading, passed 77-18 |
2017-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 7, 2017 |
2017-03-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-14 | House | to Education (H) |
2017-02-10 | House | received in House |
2017-02-09 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-1 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 9, 2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2017-02-08 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-02-08 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2017-01-07 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2017-01-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/SB50.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB50/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/SB50/vote_history.pdf |