KY SB50 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend Subchapter 27 of KRS Chapter 154 to include carbon dioxide transmission pipeline eligibility for Incentives for Energy Independence Act; grant companies constructing carbon dioxide transmission pipelines eminent domain powers; require carbon dioxide transmission pipeline to obtain construction certificate from the Ky State Board on Electric Generation and Siting; amend KRS 154.27-010, 154.27-020, 278.495, 278.700, and 278.714 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to the capture and transportation of carbon dioxide.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | signed by Governor | |
2011-03-04 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-03-04 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-03 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2011-03-02 | received in Senate | |
2011-03-01 | 3rd reading, passed 80-17 | |
2011-02-28 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 1, 2011 | |
2011-02-25 | floor amendments (1-title) and (2) filed | |
2011-02-25 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-24 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2011-02-18 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-17 | to Tourism Development & Energy (H) | |
2011-02-16 | received in House | |
2011-02-15 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-15 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 15, 2011 | |
2011-02-10 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-09 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2011-01-06 | to Natural Resources and Energy (S) | |
2011-01-05 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB50.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB50/bill.doc |