KY SB5 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-22 - to Judiciary (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-22 - to Judiciary (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 402.100 to require that the Department of Libraries and Archives revise the current marriage license form; remove the requirement that the license be signed by the issuing county or deputy clerk; and provide instead that the marriage license form allow for the name and title of the issuing official.
Title
AN ACT relating to marriage licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-22 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2016-02-19 | House | received in House |
2016-02-18 | Senate | passed 30-8 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | floor amendment (1) defeated |
2016-02-18 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2016-02-17 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2016-02-16 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 17, 2016 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2016-02-11 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-01-08 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2016-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |