KY SB5 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-04 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-04 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 6 to require appropriations and revenue bills to be available for public review prior to certain legislative actions thereon, define terms, and provide that legislation enacted without specified public review period shall be null and void; amend KRS 48.100 to establish the process for legislative action on budget bills during regular sessions of the General Assembly.
Title
AN ACT relating to legislative action on appropriations and revenue bills.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Hornback [R] | Sen. Alice Kerr [R] | Sen. Robert Leeper [I] | Sen. Jack Westwood [R] |
Sen. Mike Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-04 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-02-02 | received in House | |
2011-01-07 | passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1) | |
2011-01-07 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 7, 2011 | |
2011-01-07 | reported favorably, to Rules with committee amendment (1) | |
2011-01-07 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2011-01-07 | Committee Substitute reconsidered | |
2011-01-07 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2011-01-07 | floor amendment (2) defeated | |
2011-01-07 | 3rd reading | |
2011-01-07 | floor amendment (1) withdrawn | |
2011-01-07 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 7, 2011 | |
2011-01-06 | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) filed | |
2011-01-06 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute | |
2011-01-05 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2011-01-05 | 2nd reading | |
2011-01-05 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2011-01-04 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2011-01-04 | 1st reading | |
2011-01-04 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2011-01-04 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB5.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB5/bill.doc |