KY SB47 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Feb 14-WITHDRAWN
Title
Feb 14-WITHDRAWN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2017-01-07 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2016-10-28 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/SB47.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB47/bill.pdf |