KY SB46 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - to State Government (H)
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - to State Government (H)
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 45A to prohibit a contract being awarded to a bidder if the bidder was awarded the same or similar contract through the use of an executive agency lobbyist who was convicted of a crime related to the contract for five years after the conviction of the lobbyist; amend KRS 45A.340 to prohibit any person associated with an agency from participating in the procurement of a contract for one year after termination; make Section 1 apply to contracts entered into since January 1, 2017; RETROACTIVE.
Title
AN ACT relating to state procurement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 RSN# 1976 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | to State Government (H) |
2022-01-26 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-26 | House | received in House |
2022-01-25 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Floor Amendment (1) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2022-01-21 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2022-01-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 24, 2022 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-01-19 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-08 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2022-01-05 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |