KY SB45 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 8)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 8)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 199.896 to 199.8996 to establish operational standards for child-care centers in Kentucky.
Title
AN ACT relating to child-care centers in Kentucky.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 160 (Y: 75 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 1180 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 1180 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 8) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-02 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-28 | House | 3rd reading, passed 75-4 |
2020-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 28, 2020 |
2020-02-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-11 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-06 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | received in House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 3, 2020 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-29 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |