KY SB45 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-01 - floor amendment (3) and (4-title) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-01 - floor amendment (3) and (4-title) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 61.661, 161.585, and 21.540 to require the disclosure, upon request, of the retirement benefit information of current and former members of the General Assembly, including their name, status, and projected or actual retirement benefit payments and benefits of the same from Kentucky Retirement Systems, Kentucky Teachers' Retirement System, Legislators' Retirement Plan, and the Judicial Retirement Plan.
Title
AN ACT relating to the disclosure of public retirement information and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Christian McDaniel [R] | Sen. Joe Bowen [R] | Sen. Danny Carroll [R] | Sen. Perry Clark [D] |
Sen. C.B. Embry [R] | Sen. Chris Girdler [R] | Sen. Mike Wilson [R] | Sen. George Wise [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | floor amendment (3) and (4-title) filed |
2016-04-01 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day for Friday, April 1, 2016 |
2016-04-01 | House | taken from Rules |
2016-03-29 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed |
2016-03-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-03-15 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-25 | House | to State Government (H) |
2016-01-19 | House | received in House |
2016-01-19 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 19 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-01-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-01-07 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2016-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |