KY SB41 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 45A.717 to give the secretary of Finance and Administration the decision-making authority to settle matters for which a legal personal service contract has been awarded.
Title
AN ACT relating to authority over state contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 370 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 369 (Y: 76 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, scta 1 RSN# 853 (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 369 (Y: 76 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, scta 1 RSN# 853 (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | to Rules (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | received in House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in House floor amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House floor amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with floor amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2019-03-14 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed |
2019-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-27 | House | to State Government (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | received in House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 23-9 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-20 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |