KY SB4 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 002)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 121.120 to require the Kentucky Registry of Election Finance to publish a manual for contributing organizations to describe the legal requirements relating to campaign finance; require all candidates, slates of candidates, committees, and contributing organizations, beginning with elections scheduled in 2020, to electronically submit all campaign finance reports to the registry; require the registry to publish the names of any candidate, slate of candidates, committee, or contributing organization as a delinquent filer, if the required campaign finance reports are submitted in a nonelectronic format, and until such time as the campaign finance reports are properly filed in an electronic format; require all independent expenditure reports to be submitted electronically to the registry within 48 hours of the date that the communication is publicly distributed or otherwise publicly disseminated, beginning with elections scheduled in 2020; make technical corrections; amend KRS 121.180 to permit all candidates to amend their spending intent consistent with what the candidate is actually spending in the election, so long as the amendment is made prior to the period in which the first campaign finance report is required to be filed with the registry; extend the length of time in which a candidate may change his or her spending intent with the registry, to conform with the campaign finance report deadlines in KRS Chapter 121, instead of candidate ballot access deadlines in Chapter 118; provide for a $500 minimum penalty to be assessed by the registry against candidates who declare an exemption from filing but then exceed their spending intent without filing the required reports; eliminate the five-day grace period for the filing of required reports to the registry, and instead require the reports to be submitted to the registry within two business days after the filing deadline; make technical corrections to conform; amend KRS 121.210 to allow a candidate or slate of candidates to designate one central campaign committee as a candidate-authorized committee; make technical corrections to conform; amend KRS 121.005 to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 127 (Y: 68 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SFA 1 RSN# 782 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06Senatesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 002)
2019-02-26Senatedelivered to Governor
2019-02-26Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-02-26Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-02-26Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-25House3rd reading, passed 68-26
2019-02-20Housetaken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
2019-02-19Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 20, 2019
2019-02-19House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-15Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-12Houseposted in committee
2019-02-06Houseto Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2019-02-05Housereceived in House
2019-01-11Senate3rd reading, passed 34-2 with floor amendment (1)
2019-01-10Senatefloor amendment (1) filed
2019-01-10Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 11, 2019
2019-01-09Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2019-01-08Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2019-01-08Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2019-01-08Senate1st reading
2019-01-08Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2019-01-08Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback