KY SB37 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 74)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 74)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 186.417 and 186.412 to require the Transportation Cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations to allow the issuance of operator's licenses to current federal and state inmates who are engaged in work release programs or reentry initiatives; set forth minimum components of the regulation; make technical corrections; amend KRS 186.412 to include federal prisoners under current provisions allowing state prisoners to receive operator's licenses and personal ID cards upon release; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to operator's licenses for certain inmates and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 400 (Y: 71 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 402 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 402 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 74) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-22 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 71-18 |
2018-03-16 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 19, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-02-15 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-01 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | received in House |
2018-01-30 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 30, 2018 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-24 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-01-03 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2018-01-02 | Senate | introduced in Senate |