KY SB37 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - posted in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - posted in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 531 to prohibit a person under 18 years of age from transmitting a nude image of himself, herself, or another person under 18 years of age to another person by computer or electronic means as a violation for the first offense and a Class B misdemeanor for each subsequent offense; provide for juvenile court jurisdiction; prohibit registration as sex offender; prohibit possession of a nude image of a person under 18 years of age as a violation for the first offense and a Class B misdemeanor for each subsequent offense; provide for juvenile court jurisdiction for person under 18 at time of commission of offense and District Court jurisdiction for persons over 18; prohibit registration as sex offender.
Title
AN ACT relating to crimes and punishments.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Bowen [R] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | House | posted in committee |
2016-03-07 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2016-03-04 | House | received in House |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2016-02-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 3, 2016 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-25 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-01-07 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2016-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |