KY SB36 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 107)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 107)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 426.530 to reduce from one year to six months the time period for the right of redemption of real property sold in pursuance of a judgment or order of a court, other than an execution, if the sale did not bring two-thirds of its appraised value.
Title
AN ACT relating to the right of redemption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 107) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-31 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2014-03-31 | Senate | passed 33-3 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute |
2014-03-31 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute for Monday, March 31, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2014-03-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-26 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-26 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill |
2014-03-25 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2014-03-25 | House | 2nd reading |
2014-03-25 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | posted in committee |
2014-03-24 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | 1st reading |
2014-03-24 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2014-03-17 | House | posted in committee |
2014-03-10 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | received in House |
2014-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 30-7 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 5, 2014 |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-01-13 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |