KY SB33 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 59)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 59)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 238.505 to include electronic representations in the definition of "charity game ticket," and define "electronic pulltab device"; amend KRS 238.545 to require electronic representations of charity game tickets to conform to standards promulgated by the department in administrative regulation.
Title
AN ACT relating to charitable gaming.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Buford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 59) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-11 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Bill passed 24-9-1 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute |
2015-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute |
2015-03-10 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 58-35 with Committee Substitute |
2015-03-10 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-03-09 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2015-03-03 | House | posting waived |
2015-03-03 | House | returned to Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | 1st reading |
2015-03-03 | House | taken from Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2015-03-02 | House | to Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2015-02-27 | House | received in House |
2015-02-27 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 25-10 with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-27 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-19 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-03 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2015-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |