KY SB32 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 132)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 132)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 403.270 to specify that the existing time periods required to be considered a de facto custodian be calculated in aggragate within the last two years.
Title
AN ACT relating to children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1788 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 353 (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1571 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 353 (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1571 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 132) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Bill passed 33-0 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) for Tuesday, March 16, 2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | passed over and retained for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-3 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-15 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2021-03-15 | House | taken from Rules |
2021-03-15 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-12 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2021-03-12 | House | 2nd reading |
2021-03-12 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | 1st reading |
2021-03-11 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-02 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | received in House |
2021-02-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 24, 2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-11 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2021-01-11 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2020-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |