KY SB32 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 13)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 13)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 150.4111 to allow resident nonprofit charitable, religious, or charitable institutions to sell donated processed wildlife; amend KRS 367.668 to require professional solicitors to provide additional information on donation receptacles; repeal 367.178.
Title
AN ACT relating to donations.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Buford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 13) |
2013-03-12 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-12 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2013-03-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-03-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2013-03-07 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed |
2013-03-07 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2013-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-26 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-21 | House | to Natural Resources & Environment (H) |
2013-02-20 | House | received in House |
2013-02-19 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-1 with Committee Substitute |
2013-02-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 19, 2012 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2013-01-10 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2013-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |