KY SB277 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 159)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 159)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 151.100 to define terms; amend KRS 151.110 to make technical corrections; amend KRS 151.112 to allow the Energy and Environment Cabinet to request technical assistance from any agency or organization to carry out its duties; make technical corrections; amend KRS 151.116 to direct the Energy and Environment Cabinet to consult with the Kentucky Infrastructure Authority in developing administrative regulations; amend KRS 151.120 to make a technical correction; amend KRS 151.125 to direct the secretary of the Energy and Environment Cabinet to adopt minimum standards for floodplain management; replace instances of “certificate of inspection” with “inspection report”; amend KRS 151.220 to permit the Energy and Environment Cabinet to accept and use cooperate agreements; amend KRS 151.250 to prohibit buildings, barriers, or obstructions in floodplains or floodways without approval and a permit from the Energy and Environment Cabinet; allow the Energy and Environment Cabinet to require approval prior to construction related to agricultural operations that impact the base flood of a stream; make technical corrections; amend KRS 151.260 to direct the Energy and Environment Cabinet to notify construction permit applicants within 20 working days for a floodplain permit and 45 working days for a dam permit; allow the secretary of the Energy and Environment Cabinet to establish administrative regulations requiring some dam owners to develop and maintain emergency action plans; amend KRS 151.293 to replace instances of “certificate of inspection” with “inspection report”; replace the “United States Weather Service” with the “National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration”; make technical corrections; amend KRS 151.310 to prohibit encroachment on the reservoir area of any dam in Kentucky; amend KRS 151.600 to direct the Energy and Environment Cabinet to administer National Flood Insurance Program related activities; make technical corrections; repeal KRS 151.230.
Title
AN ACT relating to water resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 372 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2572 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2572 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 159) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2023-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-30 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2023-03-16 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2023-03-16 | House | taken from Rules |
2023-03-15 | House | reported favorably, to Rules |
2023-03-14 | House | returned to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2023-03-14 | House | 2nd reading |
2023-03-14 | House | taken from Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2023-03-13 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2023-03-13 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-13 | House | 1st reading |
2023-03-13 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-08 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-08 | House | received in House |
2023-03-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36 -0 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 08, 2023 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-01 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2023-02-23 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Environment and Conservation
Flood Control and Flooding
State Agencies
Technical Corrections
Waterways and Dams
Flood Control and Flooding
State Agencies
Technical Corrections
Waterways and Dams