KY SB265 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 141.017, 141.019 and 141.039 to allow the same treatment as for federal income tax purposes related to forgiven covered loans, deductions, and tax attributes associated with those loans in accordance with Pub. L. No. 116-260, for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2020, but before January 1, 2022.
Title
AN ACT relating to Paycheck Protection Program loans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/21RS/sb265.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/21RS/sb265/orig_bill.pdf |