KY SB263 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 179)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 179)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 224A.011 to define "asset management plan" and "merger"; amend KRS 224A.300 to clarify the goal of offering secure water and adding managerial and technical resources as needed resources for the improvement of infrastructure for the security and safety of water systems; require the Energy and Environment cabinet to provide technical support to the Kentucky Infrastructure Authority; amend KRS 224A.302 to make technical corrections; amend KRS 224.304 to rename an account in the infrastructure revolving fund and add to the purpose of the account to encourage regionalization, merger and consolidation of water and wastewater systems; amend KRS 224A.306 to make technical corrections, delete the requirement for one governmental agency water system be a partner in the merger, or consolidation; amend KRS 224A.308 to require the Kentucky Infrastructure Authority to help water systems develop or maintain asset management plans; amend KRS 224A.310 to conform and add wastewater to an incentive program targeting water systems with high debt and other problems; amend KRS 224A.312 to conform and make technical corrections; amend KRS 224A.316 to identify resiliency as a goal for the water systems and upgrade systems to prevent inflow and infiltration; give priority to funding projects that are regional; amend KRS 224A.318 to make technical corrections; amend KRS 151.603 to establish planning cycles in 5 year increments beginning in 2025; amend KRS 151.601 and 151.605 to make technical corrections; amend KRS 151.607 to make technical corrections and clarify projects that are regional have priority ranking and the goals are to consolidate or merge management and operations; repeal KRS 224A.314, relating to the study of water resource potential.
Title
AN ACT relating to the regionalization of public water and wastewater systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 369 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 RSN# 2579 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 RSN# 2579 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 179) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2023-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-30 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2023-03-30 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2023-03-30 | House | taken from Rules |
2023-03-30 | House | reported favorably, to Rules |
2023-03-16 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2023-03-15 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-15 | House | 2nd reading |
2023-03-15 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-14 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-14 | House | 1st reading |
2023-03-14 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-13 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-13 | House | received in House |
2023-03-10 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34 -0 with Floor Amendment (1) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2023-03-09 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2023-03-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2023-03-08 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2023-02-24 | Senate | reassigned to State & Local Government (S) |
2023-02-23 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | introduced in Senate |