KY SB26 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 106)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 106)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 230.400 to extend payments from the Kentucky thoroughbred development fund to nonclaiming maiden races and allowance optional claiming races and require the Kentucky Horse Racing Commission to establish requirements, conditions, and procedures for awarding payments.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Thoroughbred development fund and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 106) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-31 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2014-03-31 | Senate | passed 34-2 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) for Monday, March 31, 2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-03-20 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 25, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-03-13 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-22 | House | to Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2014-01-17 | House | received in House |
2014-01-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-1 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-01-16 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 16, 2014 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-01-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |