KY SB26 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 186.531 to establish a $4 charge for a personal identification card issued to a person without a fixed, permanent address; amend KRS 186.412 to establish that a personal identification card issued to a person without a fixed, permanent shall be valid for one year from the date of issuance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to identification cards for people experiencing homelessness.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-16 signed by Governor
2011-03-04 delivered to Governor
2011-03-04 enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2011-03-03 enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2011-03-03 received in Senate
2011-03-03 passed 99-0
2011-03-03 floor amendment (1) ruled not germane
2011-03-03 3rd reading
2011-03-03 floor amendment (2-title) filed
2011-03-03 placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 3, 2011
2011-03-02 floor amendment (1) filed
2011-03-02 reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2011-03-01 posted in committee
2011-03-01 posting waived
2011-03-01 returned to Transportation (H)
2011-03-01 1st reading
2011-03-01 taken from Transportation (H)
2011-03-01 to Transportation (H)
2011-02-28 received in House
2011-02-28 3rd reading, passed 38-0
2011-02-28 posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 28, 2011
2011-02-18 2nd reading, to Rules
2011-02-17 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2011-01-04 to Judiciary (S)
2011-01-04 introduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback