KY SB25 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 4)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 4)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide up to 10 days of remote instruction per school for school districts to use at the school, classroom, grade, or group level for the 2021-2022 school year; temporarily revise retirement reemployment provisions until June 30, 2022; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to actions in response to the SARS-CoV-2 virus and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1956 (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 27 (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 26 (Y: 26 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1948 (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 27 (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 26 (Y: 26 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1948 (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-14 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 4) |
2022-01-13 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-01-13 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-01-13 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-01-13 | Senate | passed 17-8 with Committee Substitute and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-01-13 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-01-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-01-13 | House | to Rules (S) |
2022-01-13 | House | 3rd reading, passed 84-9 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-01-13 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2022-01-13 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2022-01-13 | House | floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-01-13 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2) withdrawn |
2022-01-13 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-01-12 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed |
2022-01-12 | House | returned to State Government (H) |
2022-01-12 | House | 2nd reading |
2022-01-12 | House | taken from State Government (H) |
2022-01-11 | House | to State Government (H) |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st reading |
2022-01-11 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-11 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-11 | House | received in House |
2022-01-11 | Senate | passed 31-2 with Committee Substitute |
2022-01-11 | Senate | floor amendments (6) and (2) defeated |
2022-01-11 | Senate | floor amendments (1) (4) (3) and (5) withdrawn |
2022-01-11 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (4) ruled out of order |
2022-01-11 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2022-01-10 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2022-01-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 10, 2022 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | floor amendments (2) (3) (5) and (6) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-01-06 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (4) filed |
2022-01-06 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2022-01-05 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2022-01-05 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2022-01-05 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | 1st reading |
2022-01-04 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Actuarial Analysis
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Effective Dates, Emergency
Retirement and Pensions
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Effective Dates, Emergency
Retirement and Pensions