KY SB25 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 65A to require proposed increases in ad valorem taxes and certain fees and the levy of new ad valorem taxes or fees by special purpose governmental entities to be submitted to the legislative body of the county or city in which the special purpose governmental entity is located for review; amend KRS 75.031 to require that nonfirefighter property owner members of boards of trustees for fire protection districts and volunteer fire department districts be elected in regular November elections; amend various sections of the Kentucky Revised Statutes to conform; repeal KRS 65A.100; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2019.
Title
AN ACT relating to special purpose governmental entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SFA 1 RSN# 437 (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 437 (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 437 (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-03-22 | House | 1st reading |
2018-03-22 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-02-15 | House | received in House |
2018-02-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 22-14 with Committee Substitute (1) & floor amendment (1) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 14, 2018 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2018-01-18 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-17 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-01-05 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2018-01-04 | Senate | introduced in Senate |